Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2028 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15434 Week
» 68450 Month
» 187977 Year
» 3214830 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13218 |
09/04/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3218 |
28/05/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08150 |
12/1973 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/04/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
09/04/1955 |
Power Unit IH3404 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/04/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13218 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
21/06/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
28/05/1957 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3218 |
|
|
03/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selhurst (75C) |
|
|
12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08150 |
|
|
31/10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (EH) |
|
|
23/08/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
14/10/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08150 from Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
09/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|