Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1795 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 15838 Week
» 80792 Month
» 283456 Year
» 3310309 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3218 |
on |
02/01/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
2251 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
360 |
To Service |
Fri 02/01/1948 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 21/05/1965 |
Service Life |
17 yrs, 4 mths , 19 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/01/1948 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3218 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F) |
|
|
30/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
23/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (82G) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E) |
|
|
28/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (83G) |
|
|
21/05/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3218 |
|
|
08/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|