Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 297 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18100 Week
» 71116 Month
» 190643 Year
» 3217496 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13219 |
16/04/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3219 |
14/02/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08151 |
10/1973 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/04/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
16/04/1955 |
Power Unit IH3406 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/04/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13219 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
21/06/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
14/02/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3219 |
|
|
30/04/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08151 |
|
|
02/01/1979 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08151 from Eastleigh (EH) |
|
|
04/1980 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Eastleigh |
|
|