Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 77 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 18988 Week
» 83942 Month
» 286606 Year
» 3313459 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13228 |
15/12/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3228 |
25/11/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08160 |
05/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/12/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
15/12/1955 |
Power Unit IH3458 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/12/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13228 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Middlesbrough (51D) |
|
|
01/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
25/11/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3228 |
|
|
17/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wolverton Works () |
|
|
18/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08160 |
|
|
24/12/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08160 from Bletchley (BY) |
|
|
09/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|