Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 206 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14249 Week
» 79203 Month
» 281867 Year
» 3308720 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D323 |
19/05/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40123 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
19/05/1961 to Crewe North (5A) |
Withdrawn |
07/07/1980 |
Time in Service |
19 yrs, 1 mth , 18 dys |
Cut Up |
02/1983 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
Information |
Main generator repairs |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
19/05/1961 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/05/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/05/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D323 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd Allocated to Crewe North (5A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
03/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
03/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
07/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
09/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40123 |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
07/07/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40123 |
|
|
02/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|