Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1440 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19243 Week
» 72259 Month
» 191786 Year
» 3218639 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13232 |
12/01/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3232 |
31/10/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08164 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/01/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
12/01/1956 |
Power Unit IH3460 |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/01/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13232 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
06/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
31/10/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3232 |
|
|
26/09/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (50C) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08164 |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (DN) |
|
|
23/03/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08164 from Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
04/05/1989 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|