Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 549 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18352 Week
» 71368 Month
» 190895 Year
» 3217748 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13234 |
25/01/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3234 |
27/02/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08166 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/01/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
25/01/1956 |
Power Unit IH3469 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/01/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13234 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
27/02/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3234 |
|
|
26/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
26/09/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (50C) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08166 |
|
|
04/07/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08166 from Hull Botanic Gardens (BG) |
|
|
17/09/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|