Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 323 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2888 Week
» 1626 Month
» 415947 Year
» 1637512 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13241 02/03/1956  
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3241 13/07/1957  
TOPS (Tops) 08173 04/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0802/03/1956
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 02/03/1956 to York (North) (50A)
Withdrawn 11/12/1978 off Eastfield (ED)
Time in Service 22 yrs, 9 mths , 9 dys
Cut Up 31/03/1987
Cut At Vic Berry (at Thornton Yard)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
50A York (North) (New) on 02/03/1956
52E Percy Main 3w/e 16/06/1956
52B Heaton w/e 13/12/1958
52G Sunderland w/e 04/03/1961
52A Gateshead w/e 08/06/1963
52E Percy Main 4w/e 11/09/1965
51A Darlington w/e 10/05/1969
51L Thornaby 4w/e 11/07/1970
64H Leith Central w/e 16/10/1971
64B Haymarket 4w/e 27/05/1972
67C Ayr 4w/e 24/02/1973
ED Eastfield 4w/e 29/12/1973
   Withdrawn on 11/12/1978

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
02/03/1956 Power Unit IH3472    


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
02/03/1956 To Service To service as British Railways Number 13241
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to York (North) (50A)
Power Unit IH3472
   
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Percy Main (52E)    
13/07/1957 Renumbered Renumbered to 3241 (Pre Tops)    
13/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
04/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
08/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
11/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Percy Main (52E)    
10/05/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
11/07/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
16/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Leith Central (64H)    
27/05/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
24/02/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Ayr (67C)    
29/12/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (ED)    
04/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08173 (Tops)    
11/12/1978 Withdrawn Condemned as 08173 from Eastfield (ED)    
31/03/1987 Scrapped Broken up by Vic Berry: at Thornton Yard    

prev prev