Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 258 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2823 Week
» 1561 Month
» 415882 Year
» 1637447 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13242 06/03/1956  
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3242 10/05/1961  
TOPS (Tops) 08174 03/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0806/03/1956
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 06/03/1956 to York (North) (50A)
Withdrawn 29/08/1981 off Thornaby (TE)
Time in Service 25 yrs, 5 mths , 23 dys
Cut Up 01/03/1982
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
50A York (North) (New) on 06/03/1956
52E Percy Main 3w/e 16/06/1956
52B Heaton w/e 13/12/1958
52G Sunderland w/e 08/04/1961
52E Percy Main w/e 08/06/1963
51L Thornaby w/e 07/09/1968
   Withdrawn on 29/08/1981

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
06/03/1956 Power Unit IH3475    


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
06/03/1956 To Service To service as British Railways Number 13242
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to York (North) (50A)
Power Unit IH3475
   
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Percy Main (52E)    
13/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
08/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
10/05/1961 Renumbered Renumbered to 3242 (Pre Tops)    
08/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Percy Main (52E)    
07/09/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
03/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08174 (Tops)    
29/08/1981 Withdrawn Condemned as 08174 from Thornaby (TE)    
01/03/1982 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev