Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 741 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2856 Week
» 25362 Month
» 328552 Year
» 1550117 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13243 09/03/1956  
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3243 29/10/1960  
TOPS (Tops) 08175 12/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0809/03/1956
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 09/03/1956 to York (North) (50A)
Withdrawn 11/12/1978 off Grangemouth (GM)
Time in Service 22 yrs, 9 mths , 2 dys
Cut Up 31/12/1985
Cut At J R Adams (Glasgow)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
50A York (North) (New) on 09/03/1956
52E Percy Main 3w/e 16/06/1956
52B Heaton w/e 13/12/1958
52E Percy Main w/e 08/06/1963
52A Gateshead 4w/e 14/08/1965
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill w/e 22/01/1972
65F Grangemouth 4w/e 25/11/1972
   Withdrawn on 11/12/1978

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
09/03/1956 Power Unit IH3476    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
09/03/1956 To Service To service as 13243
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to York (North) (50A)
   
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Percy Main (52E)    
13/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
10/1960 Renumbered Renumbered to D3243    
25/03/1962 Sightings Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Crossing. SLS 5/1962 Link
08/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Percy Main (52E)    
14/08/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
22/01/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
25/11/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F)    
12/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08175    
11/12/1978 Withdrawn Condemned as 08175 from Grangemouth (GM)    
31/12/1985 Scrapped Broken up by J R Adams: Glasgow    

prev prev