Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1320 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19123 Week
» 72139 Month
» 191666 Year
» 3218519 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13246 |
14/05/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3246 |
10/12/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08178 |
05/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/05/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/05/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13246 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
10/12/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3246 |
|
|
04/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08178 |
|
|
01/05/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08178 from Derby (DY) |
|
|
10/03/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|