Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 374 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18177 Week
» 71193 Month
» 190720 Year
» 3217573 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13248 |
18/05/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3248 |
07/10/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08180 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/05/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/05/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13248 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
26/01/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
23/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
05/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3248 |
|
|
20/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08180 |
|
|
22/02/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (CA) |
|
|
08/08/1976 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
31/12/1976 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Selhurst (SU) |
|
|
05/1977 |
To Store |
To Store (Finsbury Park) |
|
|
10/03/1979 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to March (MR) |
|
|
03/05/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08180 from Shirebrook (SB) |
|
|
08/1981 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|