Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 963 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14369 Week
» 67385 Month
» 186912 Year
» 3213765 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13250 |
25/05/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3250 |
16/09/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08182 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/05/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/05/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13250 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
09/08/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3250 |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08182 |
|
|
15/03/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08182 from Saltley (SY) |
|
|
03/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|