Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 186 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 186 Week
» 6320 Month
» 234204 Year
» 1455769 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13252 01/06/1955  
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3252 02/1960  
TOPS (Tops) 08184 03/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 01/06/1955
Withdrawn 21/06/1981 off Doncaster (DR)
Time in Service 26 yrs , 20 dys
Cut Up 01/04/1982
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe (New) 01/06/1955
41A Sheffield Darnall w/e 16/09/1961
41A Tinsley 26/04/1964
36C Frodingham w/e 30/11/1968
36A Doncaster w/e 19/02/1972
   Withdrawn 21/06/1981

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe w/e 02/06/1956
ALLOC 41B Sheffield Grimesthorpe 23/02/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to D3252    
01/06/1955 To Service To service as 13252
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A)
   
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
30/11/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
19/02/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
03/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08184    
21/06/1981 Withdrawn Condemned as 08184 from Doncaster (DR)    
01/04/1982 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev