Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 646 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14689 Week
» 79643 Month
» 282307 Year
» 3309160 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13253 |
01/06/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3253 |
03/08/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08185 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/06/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/06/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13253 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A) |
|
|
03/08/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3253 |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08185 |
|
|
20/09/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
01/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (GL) |
|
|
08/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
06/09/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
14/02/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08185 from Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
10/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|