Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2988 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16394 Week
» 69410 Month
» 188937 Year
» 3215790 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (Orig) |
3255 |
m/e |
07/1895 |
Great Western Railway (1912) |
3254 |
m/e |
12/1912 |
Great Western Railway (90xx) |
9054 |
on |
08/10/1946 (at Machynlleth) |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
07/1895 |
Cornubia |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Dean |
Class |
Duke |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
101 |
Works Number |
1494 |
To Service |
During 07/1895 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 01/06/1950 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 11 mths , 2 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1895 |
MCH |
|
Machynlleth |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
01/06/1950 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
MCH |
Machynlleth |
m/e |
30/06/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1910 |
Diagram BR4 boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
03/1913 |
Diagram B4 boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
07/1918 |
Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
02/1935 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1895 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3255, name: Cornubia Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 1494 Diagram S4 boiler fitted |
|
|
06/1910 |
Modification |
Diagram BR4 boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1912 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3254 |
|
|
03/1913 |
Modification |
Diagram B4 boiler fitted |
|
|
07/1918 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
|
|
02/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
08/10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9054 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Machynlleth (MCH) |
|
|
01/06/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9054 |
|
|