Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 291 Today
» 1267 Yesterday
» 291 Week
» 34866 Month
» 104345 Year
» 1325910 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13258 20/06/1956
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3258 13/05/1960
TOPS (Tops) 08189 03/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 20/06/1956
Withdrawn 06/12/1981 off Gloucester Horton Road (GL)
Time in Service 25 yrs, 5 mths , 16 dys
Cut Up 17/03/1984
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
87F Llanelly (New) 20/06/1956
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 08/09/1956
87F Llanelly 4w/e 01/12/1956
88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 10/08/1957
88C Barry 4w/e 29/11/1958
88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 27/12/1958
88M Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 03/11/1962
86A Cardiff Canton w/e 29/11/1964
   Withdrawn 06/12/1981


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
20/06/1956 To Service To service as 13258
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Llanelly (87F)
   
08/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
01/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
29/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
27/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
13/05/1960 Renumbered Renumbered to D3258    
03/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M)    
29/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A)    
03/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08189    
06/12/1981 Withdrawn Condemned as 08189 from Gloucester Horton Road (GL)    
17/03/1984 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev