Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2307 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20110 Week
» 73126 Month
» 192653 Year
» 3219506 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13259 |
22/06/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3259 |
24/11/1961 |
At Swindon Factory |
TOPS (Tops) |
08190 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/06/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/06/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13259 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
10/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
24/11/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3259 |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08190 |
|
|
12/10/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08190 from Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
12/1980 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|