Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2061 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19864 Week
» 72880 Month
» 192407 Year
» 3219260 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13266 |
24/08/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3266 |
09/10/1959 |
At Swindon Works |
TOPS (Tops) |
08196 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/08/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/08/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13266 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) |
|
|
01/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
07/09/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
09/10/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3266 |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08196 |
|
|
31/12/1980 |
To Store |
|
|
|
01/11/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08196 from Grangemouth (GM) |
|
|
12/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J R Adams: Glasgow |
|
|