Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1128 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18931 Week
» 71947 Month
» 191474 Year
» 3218327 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13267 |
31/08/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3267 |
15/06/1961 |
At Swindon Factory |
TOPS (Tops) |
08197 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/08/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/08/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13267 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) |
|
|
01/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
02/11/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
29/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
27/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
15/06/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3267 |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
31/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
27/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
14/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
29/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shirebrook (41J) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08197 |
|
|
25/04/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08197 from York (North) (YK) |
|
|
11/02/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|