Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 835 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14241 Week
» 67257 Month
» 186784 Year
» 3213637 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13268 |
07/09/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3268 |
23/12/1960 |
At Swindon Works |
TOPS (Tops) |
08198 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/1973 |
|
Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
|
|
10/02/1973 |
|
Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/09/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
01/1973 |
vr |
Vacuum brakes, Radio Telephone fitted |
|
|
|
10/02/1973 |
vr |
Vacuum brakes, Radio Telephone fitted |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/09/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13268 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
|
|
23/12/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3268 |
|
|
18/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
01/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
01/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
10/02/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08198 |
|
|
01/12/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08198 from Swindon (SW) |
|
|
11/1981 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|