Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 4298 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17704 Week
» 70720 Month
» 190247 Year
» 3217100 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13269 |
14/09/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3269 |
12/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08199 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/09/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/09/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13269 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
|
|
12/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3269 |
|
|
24/01/1970 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
04/04/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
|
|
09/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
29/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
02/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08199 |
|
|
10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (SY) |
|
|
01/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
03/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
10/1980 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (BU) |
|
|
01/11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (LR) |
|
|
25/01/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08199 from Derby (DY) |
|
|
14/07/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|