Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1439 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14845 Week
» 67861 Month
» 187388 Year
» 3214241 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13270 |
29/09/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3270 |
23/12/1959 |
At Swindon Works |
TOPS (Tops) |
08200 |
12/1973 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/09/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/09/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13270 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
23/12/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3270 |
|
|
24/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
17/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
10/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08200 |
|
|
13/04/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08200 from Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
14/09/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|