Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 798 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5399 Week
» 16946 Month
» 416628 Year
» 493215 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13272 06/10/1956
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3272 08/1961
TOPS (Tops) 08202 01/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 06/10/1956
Withdrawn 23/05/1989 off Cardiff Canton (CF)
Time in Service 32 yrs, 7 mths , 17 dys
Cut Up 10/03/1990
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
73C Hither Green (New) 06/10/1956
75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 01/05/1962
70B Feltham 4w/e 17/12/1962
70D Eastleigh 4w/e 03/06/1969
   Withdrawn 23/05/1989

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
06/10/1956 To Service To service as 13272
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Hither Green (73C)
   
08/1961 Renumbered Renumbered to D3272    
01/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
17/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
03/06/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
01/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08202    
23/05/1989 Withdrawn Condemned as 08202 from Cardiff Canton (CF)    

prev prev