Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 97 Today
» 921 Yesterday
» 4566 Week
» 5456 Month
» 313437 Year
» 1197818 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3281 c. 0
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13281 10/11/1956
TOPS (Tops) 08211 03/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 10/11/1956
Withdrawn 03/03/1985 off Thornaby (TE)
Time in Service 28 yrs, 3 mths , 21 dys
Cut Up 31/03/1986
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
65F Grangemouth (New) 10/11/1956
56B Healey Mills 4w/e 08/10/1966
64B Haymarket 4w/e 28/12/1968
36C Frodingham w/e 01/02/1969
91E To Eastern Region 5w/e 01/03/1969
TE Thornaby 2w/e 20/11/1976
   Withdrawn 03/03/1985


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to D3281    
10/11/1956 To Service To service as 13281
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Grangemouth (65F)
   
08/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B)    
28/12/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
01/02/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
01/03/1969 Allocation Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E)    
03/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08211    
20/11/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (TE)    
03/03/1985 Withdrawn Condemned as 08211 from Thornaby (TE)    
31/03/1986 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev