Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 972 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14378 Week
» 67394 Month
» 186921 Year
» 3213774 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (Orig) |
3287 |
m/e |
03/1897 |
Great Western Railway (1912) |
3276 |
m/e |
12/1912 |
Great Western Railway (90xx) |
9076 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
03/1897 |
St. Agnes |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Dean |
Class |
Duke |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
105 |
Works Number |
1546 |
To Service |
During 03/1897 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 22/11/1949 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 8 mths , 24 dys |
Information |
Denamed: Operating dept requested name removed to avoid confusing passengers believing the name to be the destination |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1897 |
SALOP |
|
Shrewsbury |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
OXY |
|
Oxley |
4w/e |
05/11/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
22/11/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
OXY |
Oxley |
4w/e |
05/11/1949 |
WDN |
OXY |
Oxley |
m/e |
30/11/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1911 |
Diagram B4 boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
03/1915 |
Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
02/1920 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1897 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3287, name: St. Agnes Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 1546 Diagram S4 boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1911 |
Modification |
Diagram B4 boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1912 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3276 |
|
|
03/1915 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
|
|
02/1920 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9076 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Shrewsbury (SALOP) |
|
|
05/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (OXY) |
|
|
22/11/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9076 |
|
|