Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 3411 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16817 Week
» 69833 Month
» 189360 Year
» 3216213 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13291 |
21/12/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3291 |
21/07/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08221 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/12/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/12/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13291 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A) |
|
|
23/02/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
10/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
25/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
21/07/1962 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3291 |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
12/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (BY) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08221 |
|
|
01/03/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08221 from Bletchley (BY) |
|
|
30/11/1981 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|