Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1093 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18896 Week
» 71912 Month
» 191439 Year
» 3218292 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13294 |
28/12/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3294 |
16/03/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08224 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/12/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/12/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13294 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
16/03/1963 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3294 |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
20/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Royston (55D) |
|
|
13/03/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (55F) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08224 |
|
|
27/07/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08224 from Doncaster (DR) |
|
|
03/12/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Gwent Demolition: Margam |
|
|