Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 2 Online
» 330 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18133 Week
» 71149 Month
» 190676 Year
» 3217529 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13297 |
04/02/1957 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3297 |
25/10/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08227 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/02/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/02/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13297 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Stourton (55B) |
|
|
25/10/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3297 |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
01/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
31/08/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) |
|
|
26/12/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
01/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08227 |
|
|
01/11/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08227 from Dunfermline Townhill (DT) |
|
|
12/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J R Adams: Glasgow |
|
|