Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 212 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1311 Week
» 7445 Month
» 235329 Year
» 1456894 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13297 04/02/1957  
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3297 25/10/1961  
TOPS (Tops) 08227 04/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 04/02/1957
Withdrawn 01/11/1983 off Dunfermline Townhill (DT)
Time in Service 26 yrs, 8 mths , 28 dys
Cut Up 31/12/1985
Cut At J R Adams (Glasgow)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
55B Stourton (New) 04/02/1957
56B Healey Mills 4w/e 08/10/1966
66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/06/1968
67A Corkerhill 5w/e 31/08/1968
66A Polmadie 4w/e 26/12/1970
65A Eastfield 5w/e 01/04/1972
   Withdrawn 01/11/1983

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 25/05/1968
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/06/1968
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 31/08/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
04/02/1957 To Service To service as 13297
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Stourton (55B)
   
25/10/1961 Renumbered Renumbered to D3297    
08/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B)    
01/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
31/08/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
15/06/1969 Sightings Corkerhill depot: On shed RO 9/1969 Link
26/12/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
01/04/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
04/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08227    
01/11/1983 Withdrawn Condemned as 08227 from Dunfermline Townhill (DT)    
31/12/1985 Scrapped Broken up by J R Adams: Glasgow    

prev prev