Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 6 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 5350 Week
» 6240 Month
» 314221 Year
» 1198602 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13299 05/04/1956
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3299 04/10/1958
TOPS (Tops) 08229 03/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 05/04/1956
Withdrawn 04/12/1977 off Frodingham (FH)
Time in Service 21 yrs, 7 mths , 29 dys
Cut Up 01/12/1978
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 05/04/1956
30F Parkeston Quay 4w/e 19/07/1958
30E Colchester w/e 07/01/1967
36C Frodingham w/e 27/06/1970
   Withdrawn 04/12/1977

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
05/04/1956 Power Unit IH3485    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
05/04/1956 To Service To service as 13299
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
19/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
09/1958 Renumbered Renumbered to D3299    
07/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
27/06/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
03/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08229    
04/12/1977 Withdrawn Condemned as 08229 from Frodingham (FH)    
01/12/1978 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev