Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 921 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14327 Week
» 67343 Month
» 186870 Year
» 3213723 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13300 |
12/04/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3300 |
27/12/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08230 |
30/10/1973 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/04/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
12/04/1956 |
Power Unit IH3488 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/04/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13300 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
27/12/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3300 |
|
|
30/10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08230 |
|
|
10/03/1979 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
28/09/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08230 from March (MR) |
|
|
05/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|