Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 662 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18465 Week
» 71481 Month
» 191008 Year
» 3217861 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13303 |
25/05/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3303 |
04/10/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08233 |
07/11/1973 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/05/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
25/05/1956 |
Power Unit IH3492 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/05/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13303 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3303 |
|
|
07/11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08233 |
|
|
10/05/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08233 from Stratford (SF) |
|
|
03/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by G Morris: at Stratford MPD |
|
|