Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 2144 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19947 Week
» 72963 Month
» 192490 Year
» 3219343 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13305 |
08/05/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3305 |
05/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08235 |
05/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/05/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
08/05/1956 |
Power Unit IH3496 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/05/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13305 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
05/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3305 |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08235 |
|
|
14/06/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (BY) |
|
|
10/07/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08235 from Bletchley (BY) |
|
|
08/09/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|