Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1629 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19432 Week
» 72448 Month
» 191975 Year
» 3218828 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13311 |
12/06/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3311 |
18/04/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08241 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/06/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
12/06/1956 |
Power Unit IH3506 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/06/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13311 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
18/04/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3311 |
|
|
14/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
28/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08241 |
|
|
25/10/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08241 from Stratford (SF) |
|
|
05/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|