Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 4175 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17581 Week
» 70597 Month
» 190124 Year
» 3216977 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13312 |
15/06/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3312 |
17/06/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08242 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/06/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
15/06/1956 |
Power Unit IH3507 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/06/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13312 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
17/06/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3312 |
|
|
14/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
28/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08242 |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
14/12/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08242 from Lincoln (LN) |
|
|
04/1990 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: at Lincoln MPD |
|
|