Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2088 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19891 Week
» 72907 Month
» 192434 Year
» 3219287 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13313 |
25/06/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3313 |
08/06/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08243 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1975 |
|
Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
|
|
30/12/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
30/12/1975 |
|
Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/06/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
12/1975 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
30/12/1975 |
a |
Air brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
25/06/1956 |
Power Unit IH3510 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/06/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13313 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
08/06/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3313 |
|
|
23/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
26/09/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (50C) |
|
|
11/12/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
14/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08243 |
|
|
12/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
30/12/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
30/12/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
25/01/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (NL) |
|
|
18/02/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08243 from Willesden (WN) |
|
|
01/1988 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Birds: Long Marston |
|
|