Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 3411 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16817 Week
» 69833 Month
» 189360 Year
» 3216213 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13316 |
20/09/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3316 |
27/01/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08246 |
09/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 07/1971 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/09/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
20/09/1956 |
Power Unit IH3529 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/09/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13316 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
13/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
27/01/1962 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3316 |
|
|
08/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
14/08/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
22/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leith Central (64H) |
|
|
27/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
24/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Townhill (62C) |
|
|
29/12/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08246 |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
06/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (GM) |
|
|
08/08/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08246 from Grangemouth (GM) |
|
|
04/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by D Christie: Camlackie |
|
|