Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1012 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18815 Week
» 71831 Month
» 191358 Year
» 3218211 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13321 |
23/10/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3321 |
24/01/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08251 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/10/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
23/10/1956 |
Power Unit IH3539 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/10/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13321 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
13/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
24/01/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3321 |
|
|
08/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
14/08/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
01/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (67C) |
|
|
20/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
31/08/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08251 |
|
|
14/09/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08251 from Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
01/1981 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|