Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2676 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16082 Week
» 69098 Month
» 188625 Year
» 3215478 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13323 |
13/11/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3323 |
02/09/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08253 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/11/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
13/11/1956 |
Power Unit IH3540 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/11/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13323 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
02/09/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3323 |
|
|
26/09/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (50C) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08253 |
|
|
25/02/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08253 from York (North) (YK) |
|
|
07/1988 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|