Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1172 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 24803 Week
» 89757 Month
» 292421 Year
» 3319274 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13325 |
23/11/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3325 |
03/02/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08255 |
02/02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/11/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
23/11/1956 |
Power Unit IH3554 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/11/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13325 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
26/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
03/02/1962 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3325 |
|
|
15/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
31/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shirebrook (41J) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08255 |
|
|
07/10/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08255 from Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
03/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|