Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2061 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15467 Week
» 68483 Month
» 188010 Year
» 3214863 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13330 |
21/12/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3330 |
01/11/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08260 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/12/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
21/12/1956 |
Power Unit IH3546 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/12/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13330 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Mexborough (36B) |
|
|
02/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
01/11/1962 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3330 |
|
|
02/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41B) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08260 |
|
|
23/08/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shirebrook (SB) |
|
|
21/08/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08260 from Shirebrook (SB) |
|
|
22/10/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|