Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 780 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14186 Week
» 67202 Month
» 186729 Year
» 3213582 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13335 |
30/01/1957 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3335 |
02/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08265 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 07/1971 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/01/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/01/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13335 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) |
|
|
02/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
02/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3335 |
|
|
05/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
12/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
07/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) |
|
|
06/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08265 |
|
|
31/12/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08265 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
30/04/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|