Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 495 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5096 Week
» 16643 Month
» 416325 Year
» 492912 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13336 20/02/1957
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3336 10/02/1962
TOPS (Tops) 08266 02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 20/02/1957
Withdrawn 17/03/1985 off Shirebrook (SB)
Time in Service 28 yrs , 25 dys
Cut Up 31/12/1985
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 20/02/1957
34A Kings Cross 4w/e 18/05/1957
41A Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 10/05/1958
41B Sheffield Grimesthorpe w/e 15/04/1961
41A Sheffield Darnall w/e 16/09/1961
41A Tinsley w/e 02/05/1964
   Withdrawn 17/03/1985

Preservation
Current Status Operational
Status Date 22/03/2011
Link www.kwvr.co.uk


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
20/02/1957 To Service To service as 13336
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
18/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
10/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
15/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (41B)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
10/02/1962 Renumbered Renumbered to D3336    
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
14/11/1964 Sightings A visit to Canklow shed: On shed John Thickitt Link
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08266    
17/03/1985 Withdrawn Condemned as 08266 from Shirebrook (SB)    

prev prev