Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 312 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18115 Week
» 71131 Month
» 190658 Year
» 3217511 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13352 |
07/06/1957 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3352 |
27/08/1962 |
At Swindon Factory |
TOPS (Tops) |
08282 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/06/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/06/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13352 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
27/08/1962 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3352 |
|
|
04/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Margam (87B) |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
30/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
31/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
16/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08282 |
|
|
02/11/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08282 from Allerton (AN) |
|
|
08/1981 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|