Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1034 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18837 Week
» 71853 Month
» 191380 Year
» 3218233 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13353 |
11/06/1957 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3353 |
02/01/1962 |
At Swindon Factory |
TOPS (Tops) |
08283 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 07/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/06/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/06/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13353 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
02/01/1962 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3353 |
|
|
22/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
30/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
31/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
16/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
07/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08283 |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
24/02/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08283 from Longsight (LO) |
|
|
16/11/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|