Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 812 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5386 Week
» 33344 Month
» 67986 Year
» 1289551 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13354 14/06/1957
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3354 22/03/1962
TOPS (Tops) 08284 02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 14/06/1957
Withdrawn 01/05/1985 off Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP)
Time in Service 27 yrs, 10 mths , 17 dys
Cut Up 31/12/1987
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
87F Llanelly (New) 14/06/1957
87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 02/11/1957
87F Llanelly 4w/e 11/07/1959
87E Landore 7w/e 22/06/1964
81C Southall 6w/e 19/09/1965
91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 31/08/1967
8C Speke Junction w/e 16/09/1967
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 18/12/1971
   Withdrawn 01/05/1985


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
14/06/1957 To Service To service as 13354
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Llanelly (87F)
   
02/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
11/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
04/03/1962 Sightings Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop.   Link
22/03/1962 Renumbered Renumbered to D3354    
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
19/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
31/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
16/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
18/12/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08284    
01/05/1985 Withdrawn Condemned as 08284 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP)    
31/12/1987 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev