Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 295 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18098 Week
» 71114 Month
» 190641 Year
» 3217494 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13357 |
27/06/1957 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3357 |
1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08287 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/06/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/06/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13357 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
10/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
12/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
1962 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3357 |
|
|
04/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
29/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shirebrook (41J) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08287 |
|
|
27/02/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08287 from Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
03/09/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|