Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 3307 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16713 Week
» 69729 Month
» 189256 Year
» 3216109 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3360 |
05/07/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08290 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/07/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/07/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3360 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
10/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
01/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
21/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
18/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
11/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
29/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
27/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Danygraig (87C) |
|
|
13/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
31/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
16/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08290 |
|
|
25/04/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08290 from Allerton (AN) |
|
|
10/03/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|