Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 495 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5096 Week
» 16643 Month
» 416325 Year
» 492912 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13366 31/05/1957
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3366 09/03/1962
TOPS (Tops) 08296 02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 31/05/1957
Withdrawn 30/10/1988 off York (North) (YK)
Time in Service 31 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
88B Cardiff East Dock (New) 31/05/1957
88C Barry 4w/e 29/11/1958
88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 27/12/1958
88M Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 03/11/1962
86A Cardiff Canton w/e 29/11/1964
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 21/10/1967
8J Allerton w/e 10/01/1970
   Withdrawn 30/10/1988

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
0000 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    
31/05/1957 To Service To service as 13366
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)
   
29/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
27/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
04/03/1962 Sightings Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop.   Link
09/03/1962 Renumbered Renumbered to D3366    
03/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M)    
29/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A)    
21/10/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
10/01/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Allerton (8J)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08296    
30/10/1988 Withdrawn Condemned as 08296 from York (North) (YK)    

prev prev